California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill March 20, 2012