|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 470, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4781.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4830.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|