California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1529 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill May 3, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012