|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 6684.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4933.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 5073.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|