California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill May 21, 2012
Bill March 14, 2012