05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). | |||
03/29/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/27/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/02/2012 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
01/25/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. | |||
01/24/2012 | Read first time. To print. |