California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2012

Amended

Bill April 19, 2012
Bill March 28, 2012
Bill March 19, 2012
Bill March 13, 2012