|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 2317.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hancock. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2318.)
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 20. Page 1642.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 18.
|
|
|
|
01/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|