LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB155
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB155
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB155
Compare Versions
AB155 Chaptered September 23, 2011
AB155 Enrolled September 14, 2011
AB155 Amended September 9, 2011
AB155 Amended August 29, 2011
AB155 Amended May 2, 2011
AB155 Amended March 3, 2011
AB155 Introduced January 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB155 Chaptered September 23, 2011
AB155 Enrolled September 14, 2011
AB155 Amended September 9, 2011
AB155 Amended August 29, 2011
AB155 Amended May 2, 2011
AB155 Amended March 3, 2011
AB155 Introduced January 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare