08/27/2012 | Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4875.) | |||
08/23/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |||
08/22/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
08/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
07/05/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 5169.) | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 2). | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
01/27/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. | |||
01/26/2012 | Introduced. To print. |