LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1551
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1551
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1551
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 26, 2012
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 11, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
September 25, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 22, 2012
Compare
Bill
July 5, 2012
Compare