California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1572 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2012

Amended

Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 28, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012