LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1572
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1572
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1572
Compare Versions
AB1572 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB1572 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1572 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1572 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1572 Amended June 28, 2012
AB1572 Amended May 29, 2012
AB1572 Amended April 23, 2012
AB1572 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1572 Introduced February 1, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1572 Chaptered September 13, 2012
AB1572 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1572 Amended August 14, 2012
AB1572 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1572 Amended June 28, 2012
AB1572 Amended May 29, 2012
AB1572 Amended April 23, 2012
AB1572 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1572 Introduced February 1, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare