|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 776, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6382.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4745.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5176.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5186.)
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 5106.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|