California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1575 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill May 30, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012