|
07/12/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5107.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|