California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1576 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2012

Amended

Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012
Bill March 13, 2012