|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 633, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4471.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 11. Page 4671.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
|
02/02/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|