California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1581 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012