|
07/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4320.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4977.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4916.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|