BILL NUMBER: AB 1595CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 165 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 24, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 24, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 6, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 10, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cook FEBRUARY 6, 2012 An act to amend Section 38012 of, to add Section 500 to, and to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 38600) to Division 16.5 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1595, Cook. Vehicles: recreational off-highway vehicles. (1) Existing law establishes rules for the operation of, and requirements for equipment of, an off-highway vehicle. A violation of these rules and requirements is a crime. This bill would define an off-highway motor vehicle to include a recreational off-highway vehicle, as defined. The bill would establish additional requirements governing the operation of a recreational off-highway vehicle. Because a violation of these provisions is a crime, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program. (2) The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 500 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 500. "Recreational off-highway vehicle" means a motor vehicle meeting all of the following criteria: (a) Designed by the manufacturer for operation primarily off of the highway. (b) Has a steering wheel for steering control. (c) Has nonstraddle seating provided by the manufacturer for the operator and all passengers. (d) (1) Has a maximum speed capability of greater than 30 miles per hour. (2) A vehicle designed by the manufacturer with a maximum speed capability of 30 miles per hour or less but is modified so that it has a maximum speed capability of greater than 30 miles per hour satisfies the criteria set forth in this subdivision. (e) Has an engine displacement equal to or less than 1,000cc (61 ci). SEC. 2. Section 38012 of the Vehicle Code is amended to read: 38012. (a) As used in this division, "off-highway motor vehicle subject to identification" means a motor vehicle subject to subdivision (a) of Section 38010. (b) As used in this division, "off-highway motor vehicle" includes, but is not limited to, the following: (1) A motorcycle or motor-driven cycle, except for any motorcycle that is eligible for a special transportation identification device issued pursuant to Section 38088. (2) A snowmobile or other vehicle designed to travel over snow or ice, as defined in Section 557. (3) A motor vehicle commonly referred to as a sand buggy, dune buggy, or all-terrain vehicle. (4) A motor vehicle commonly referred to as a jeep. (5) A recreational off-highway vehicle as defined in Section 500. SEC. 3. Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 38600) is added to Division 16.5 of the Vehicle Code, to read: CHAPTER 8. RECREATIONAL OFF-HIGHWAY VEHICLES 38600. A person operating a recreational off-highway vehicle shall be at least 16 years of age, or be directly supervised in the vehicle by a parent or guardian or by an adult authorized by the parent or guardian. 38601. A person shall not operate, or allow a passenger in, a recreational off-highway vehicle unless the person and the passenger are wearing safety helmets meeting the requirements established for motorcycles and motorized bicycles pursuant to Section 27802. 38602. A person operating, and any passenger in, a recreational off-highway vehicle shall wear a seatbelt and shoulder belt or safety harness that is properly fastened when the vehicle is in motion. 38603. A person operating a recreational off-highway vehicle shall not allow a passenger to occupy a separate seat location not designed and provided by the manufacturer for a passenger. 38604. A person operating a recreational off-highway vehicle shall not ride with a passenger, unless the passenger, while seated upright with his or her back against the seatback with both feet flat on the floorboard, can grasp the occupant handhold with the seatbelt and shoulder belt or safety harness properly fastened. SEC. 4. No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.