|
08/25/2011
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1726.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 19.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|