LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB160
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB160
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB160
Compare Versions
AB160 Amended July 6, 2011
AB160 Amended June 20, 2011
AB160 Amended May 27, 2011
AB160 Amended May 9, 2011
AB160 Amended February 28, 2011
AB160 Introduced January 19, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB160 Amended July 6, 2011
AB160 Amended June 20, 2011
AB160 Amended May 27, 2011
AB160 Amended May 9, 2011
AB160 Amended February 28, 2011
AB160 Introduced January 19, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare