|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 471, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6643.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4931.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4337.)
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
|
|
|
|
02/07/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|