California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012