|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 743, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 6103.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4569.).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 14. Page 4184.)
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (March 21).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|