BILL NUMBER: AB 1614CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 743 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 29, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 20, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 18, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 12, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Monning (Coauthor: Assembly Member Alejo) (Coauthors: Senators Blakeslee and Cannella) FEBRUARY 8, 2012 An act to amend Section 67700 of, and to repeal Sections 67679.5 and 67686 of, the Government Code, relating to the Fort Ord Reuse Authority. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1614, Monning. Fort Ord Reuse Authority. Existing law, the Fort Ord Reuse Authority Act, establishes the Fort Ord Reuse Authority to prepare, adopt, finance, and implement a plan for the use and development of the territory previously occupied by the Fort Ord military base in Monterey County. The act provides that the authority is governed by a board consisting of members from specified cities and authorizes the board to acquire and dispose of existing real property and facilities within the Fort Ord territory, to plan, finance, and construct new public capital facilities within that territory, to levy assessments, special taxes, or development fees, and to issue bonds. The act makes these provisions inoperative when the board determines that 80% of the territory of Fort Ord that is designated for development or reuse in the plan has been developed or reused in a manner consistent with the plan, or June 30, 2014, whichever occurs first, and repeals these provisions on January 1, 2015. This bill would instead make the act inoperative when the board makes the above specified determination, or June 30, 2020, whichever occurs first, and would repeal the act on January 1, 2021. This bill would also require the board to submit and approve a transition plan to the Monterey County Local Agency Formation Commission, as specified. The Fort Ord Reuse Authority Act also authorizes the board to, by ordinance, establish the Redevelopment Agency of Fort Ord and requires that a city or county receiving state subventions based on the military population residing at Fort Ord continue for a specified period. This bill would repeal the board's authorization to establish the Redevelopment Agency of Fort Ord and would repeal the provisions relating to the continuance of state subventions. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 67679.5 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 67686 of the Government Code is repealed. SEC. 3. Section 67700 of the Government Code is amended to read: 67700. (a) This title shall become inoperative when the board determines that 80 percent of the territory of Fort Ord that is designated for development or reuse in the plan prepared pursuant to this title has been developed or reused in a manner consistent with the plan adopted or revised pursuant to Section 67675, or June 30, 2020, whichever occurs first, and on January 1, 2021, this title is repealed. (b) (1) The Monterey County Local Agency Formation Commission shall provide for the orderly dissolution of the authority including ensuring that all contracts, agreements, and pledges to pay or repay money entered into by the authority are honored and properly administered, and that all assets of the authority are appropriately transferred. (2) The board shall approve and submit a transition plan to the Monterey County Local Agency Formation Commission on or before December 30, 2018, or 18 months before the anticipated inoperability of this title pursuant to subdivision (a), whichever occurs first. The transition plan shall assign assets and liabilities, designate responsible successor agencies, and provide a schedule of remaining obligations. The transition plan shall be approved only by a majority vote of the board.