California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1648 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill May 31, 2012
Bill May 17, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012