LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1648
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1648
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1648
Compare Versions
AB1648 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1648 Amended May 31, 2012
AB1648 Amended May 17, 2012
AB1648 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1648 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1648 Amended August 16, 2012
AB1648 Amended May 31, 2012
AB1648 Amended May 17, 2012
AB1648 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1648 Introduced February 13, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare