|
10/08/2011
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2932.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 2932.).
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2249.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 1786.)
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|