LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB165
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB165
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB165
Compare Versions
AB165 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB165 Amended August 30, 2011
AB165 Amended August 15, 2011
AB165 Amended June 20, 2011
AB165 Amended May 27, 2011
AB165 Amended May 5, 2011
AB165 Amended April 13, 2011
AB165 Introduced January 20, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB165 Enrolled September 9, 2011
AB165 Amended August 30, 2011
AB165 Amended August 15, 2011
AB165 Amended June 20, 2011
AB165 Amended May 27, 2011
AB165 Amended May 5, 2011
AB165 Amended April 13, 2011
AB165 Introduced January 20, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare