California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1660 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012