LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1660
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1660
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1660
Compare Versions
AB1660 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB1660 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1660 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1660 Amended June 21, 2012
AB1660 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1660 Amended April 23, 2012
AB1660 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1660 Chaptered September 27, 2012
AB1660 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB1660 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1660 Amended June 21, 2012
AB1660 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1660 Amended April 23, 2012
AB1660 Introduced February 14, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare