California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1694 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2012

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 13, 2012

Amended

Bill April 25, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill March 21, 2012