LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1694
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1694
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1694
Compare Versions
AB1694 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB1694 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1694 Amended April 25, 2012
AB1694 Amended April 16, 2012
AB1694 Amended March 21, 2012
AB1694 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1694 Chaptered July 13, 2012
AB1694 Enrolled July 2, 2012
AB1694 Amended April 25, 2012
AB1694 Amended April 16, 2012
AB1694 Amended March 21, 2012
AB1694 Introduced February 15, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare