|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3623.)
|
|
|
|
01/23/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, final hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (January 19).
|
|
|
|
01/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|