LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB17
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB17
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB17
Compare Versions
AB17 Amended August 20, 2012
AB17 Amended August 6, 2012
AB17 Amended July 5, 2012
AB17 Amended June 15, 2012
AB17 Amended January 13, 2012
AB17 Amended May 11, 2011
AB17 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB17 Amended August 20, 2012
AB17 Amended August 6, 2012
AB17 Amended July 5, 2012
AB17 Amended June 15, 2012
AB17 Amended January 13, 2012
AB17 Amended May 11, 2011
AB17 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare