|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 425, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:10 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 6408.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4750.).
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5113.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (April 11).
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|