LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1729
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1729
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1729
Compare Versions
AB1729 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB1729 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB1729 Amended August 20, 2012
AB1729 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1729 Amended May 7, 2012
AB1729 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1729 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1729 Chaptered September 21, 2012
AB1729 Enrolled September 6, 2012
AB1729 Amended August 20, 2012
AB1729 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1729 Amended May 7, 2012
AB1729 Amended April 24, 2012
AB1729 Introduced February 16, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare