|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 4940.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 13).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.)
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 24.
|
|
|
|
01/24/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|