California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB174 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 22, 2012
Bill August 14, 2012
Bill August 9, 2012
Bill June 13, 2012
Bill March 21, 2011