California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1779 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012