LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1779
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1779
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1779
Compare Versions
AB1779 Chaptered September 29, 2012
AB1779 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1779 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1779 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1779 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1779 Amended June 27, 2012
AB1779 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1779 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1779 Amended April 17, 2012
AB1779 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1779 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1779 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1779 Chaptered September 29, 2012
AB1779 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1779 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1779 Amended August 21, 2012
AB1779 Amended August 6, 2012
AB1779 Amended June 27, 2012
AB1779 Amended May 25, 2012
AB1779 Amended April 19, 2012
AB1779 Amended April 17, 2012
AB1779 Amended April 9, 2012
AB1779 Amended March 29, 2012
AB1779 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare