|
09/19/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 6377.).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4743.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 1714.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|