LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB18
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB18
Compare Versions
AB18 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB18 Amended August 8, 2012
AB18 Amended July 6, 2012
AB18 Amended June 19, 2012
AB18 Amended July 5, 2011
AB18 Amended May 27, 2011
AB18 Amended April 27, 2011
AB18 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB18 Enrolled August 31, 2012
AB18 Amended August 8, 2012
AB18 Amended July 6, 2012
AB18 Amended June 19, 2012
AB18 Amended July 5, 2011
AB18 Amended May 27, 2011
AB18 Amended April 27, 2011
AB18 Introduced December 6, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare