|
09/26/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 6679.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4929.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 4773.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|