LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1811
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1811
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1811
Compare Versions
AB1811 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1811 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1811 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1811 Amended June 12, 2012
AB1811 Amended May 3, 2012
AB1811 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1811 Amended March 5, 2012
AB1811 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
AB1811 Enrolled September 11, 2012
AB1811 Amended August 24, 2012
AB1811 Amended July 2, 2012
AB1811 Amended June 12, 2012
AB1811 Amended May 3, 2012
AB1811 Amended April 10, 2012
AB1811 Amended March 5, 2012
AB1811 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare