|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 3207.).
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 2403.).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 17. Noes 16. Page 2316.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Kehoe. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2316.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 15).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by Committee.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 1564.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1434.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|