LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB183
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB183
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB183
Compare Versions
AB183 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB183 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB183 Amended June 22, 2011
AB183 Amended May 19, 2011
AB183 Introduced January 25, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB183 Chaptered October 9, 2011
AB183 Enrolled September 19, 2011
AB183 Amended June 22, 2011
AB183 Amended May 19, 2011
AB183 Introduced January 25, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare