California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1845 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill July 5, 2012
Bill June 18, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012